Download
slide1 n.
Skip this Video
Loading SlideShow in 5 Seconds..
Worldwide Multiplication PowerPoint Presentation
Download Presentation
Worldwide Multiplication

Worldwide Multiplication

106 Views Download Presentation
Download Presentation

Worldwide Multiplication

- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
Presentation Transcript

  1. Worldwide Multiplication

  2. British Multiplication Also known as: The Tower method

  3. 46x37 46 x37 322 1380 1702 • Work out 46x7 and write answer in columns • Put a zero • Then work out 46x3 • Add down the columns • Answer 1702 • Mistakes Made by Students • Basic multiplication is not strong enough • Forget the zero or put it with the ‘322’ • Answers not in columns so don’t add properly • Find 6x7 then 4x3 and write answer as 1242 • Many many more!!!

  4. Chinese MultiplicationA free download from www.emaths.co.uk Alsoknown as: The Gelosia method The Lattice Method

  5. 46 × 37 Draw grid Draw lattice

  6. 4 6 46 × 37 3 7

  7. 6×3 4 6 46 × 37 1 3 8 7

  8. 4 6 46 × 37 1 3 8 6×7 4 7 2

  9. 4 6 4×3 46 × 37 1 1 3 2 8 4 7 2

  10. 4 6 46 × 37 1 1 3 2 8 4×7 2 4 7 8 2

  11. 4 6 46 × 37 Add diagonals 1 1 3 8 2 2 4 7 8 2

  12. 4 6 46 × 37 1 1 3 2 8 2 4 7 8 2 2

  13. 4 6 46 × 37 8+4+8=20 1 1 3 2 8 2 4 7 2 8 2 0 2

  14. 4 6 2+2+2+1=7 46 × 37 1 1 3 2 8 2 4 7 2 8 2 7 0 2

  15. 4 6 46 × 37 1 1 3 1 2 8 2 4 7 2 8 2 7 0 2

  16. 4 6 46 × 37 = 1702 1 1 3 1 2 8 2 4 7 2 8 2 7 Read off answer 0 2

  17. Russian Multiplication Skills: Doubling; Halving; Adding A free download from www.emaths.co.uk

  18. ´ 7391 Half 73. Ignore any ½ s Double 91 73 91 36 182

  19. Half 36. Double 182

  20. Double 364 Half 18

  21. Half 9. Ignore any ½ s Double 728

  22. Half 4. Double 1456

  23. Half 2. Double 2812

  24. Cross out all the rows which have an even number in the left hand column

  25. Add up the numbers remaining in the right hand column 91 + 728 + 5624

  26. Egyptian Multiplication Skills: Doubling A free download from www.emaths.co.uk

  27. 51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088

  28. 51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088 51 = 32+16+2+1

  29. 51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088 51 = 32+16+2+1

  30. 51×17 17 34 272 544 867 1×17=17 2×17=34 16×17=272 32×17=544 +