Multiplying by 2 digit factors
Download
1 / 9

Multiplying by 2-digit factors - PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 91 Views
  • Uploaded on

Multiplying by 2-digit factors. Partial Products. How can we multiply 23 × 15. Draw a box and divide it into four pieces. Write the value of each digit in the number 23 across the top. Then write the value of each digit in the number 15 on the side of the box. . 20. 3. 10. 5.

loader
I am the owner, or an agent authorized to act on behalf of the owner, of the copyrighted work described.
capcha
Download Presentation

PowerPoint Slideshow about 'Multiplying by 2-digit factors' - yehudi


An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
Presentation Transcript

How can we multiply 23 15
How can we multiply 23 × 15

  • Draw a box and divide it into four pieces.

  • Write the value of each digit in the number 23 across the top. Then write the value of each digit in the number 15 on the side of the box.

20

3

10

5


How can we multiply 23 151
How can we multiply 23 × 15

3. Multiply the two numbers that meet in each box.

20

3

200

30

10

100

15

5


How can we multiply 23 152
How can we multiply 23 × 15

4. Add of the 4 products that are in the boxes together.

200

100

30

+ 15

20

3

200

30

10

100

15

5

345


How can we multiply 23 153
How can we multiply 23 × 15

23 × 15 = 345

200

100

30

+ 15

20

3

200

30

10

100

15

5

345


Multiply 47 24
Multiply 47 × 24

1. Draw your box

40

7

800

160

140

+ 28

800

140

20

160

28

4

2. Label the box

1128

3. Multiply

4. Add


Multiply 73 46
Multiply 73 × 46

1. Draw your box

70

3

2800

420

120

+ 18

2800

120

40

420

18

6

2. Label the box

3358

3. Multiply

4. Add


M ultiply 37 18
Multiply 37 × 18

300

240

70

+ 56

30

7

300

70

10

240

56

8

666