Partial products multiplication
Download
1 / 18

- PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 121 Views
  • Updated On :

Partial Products Multiplication. Step by Step. 742 * 29. Expand each number. 742=700+40+2. 742 * 29. Expand each number . 742=700+40+2. 29 = 20+9. 742 * 29. Multiply 700 * 20. 742= 700 +40+2. 29 = 20 +9. 700 * 20 = 14000. 742 * 29. Multiply 700 * 9. 742= 700 +40+2. 29 = 20+ 9.

loader
I am the owner, or an agent authorized to act on behalf of the owner, of the copyrighted work described.
capcha
Download Presentation

PowerPoint Slideshow about '' - thane


An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
Presentation Transcript
Partial products multiplication l.jpg

Partial ProductsMultiplication

Step by Step


Slide2 l.jpg

742 * 29

Expand each number.

742=700+40+2


Slide3 l.jpg

742 * 29

Expand each number.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9


Slide4 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 700 * 20.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000


Slide5 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 700 * 9.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300


Slide6 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 40 * 20.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300

40 * 20 = 800


Slide7 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 40 * 9.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300

40 * 20 = 800

40 * 9 = 360


Slide8 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 2 * 20.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300

40 * 20 = 800

40 * 9 = 360

2 * 20 = 40


Slide9 l.jpg

742 * 29

Multiply 2 * 9.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300

40 * 20 = 800

40 * 9 = 360

2 * 20 = 40

2 * 9 = 18


Slide10 l.jpg

742 * 29

Now, add all you products.

742=700+40+2

29 = 20+9

700 * 20 = 14000

700 * 9 = 6300

40 * 20 = 800

40 * 9 = 360

2 * 20 = 40

2 * 9 = +18

21,518


Slide11 l.jpg

742 * 29 =

21,518



Slide13 l.jpg

What if there are decimals in the problem???

If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.


Slide14 l.jpg

What if there are decimals in the problem???

If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068


Slide15 l.jpg

What if there are decimals in the problem???

If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068

Where do I put my decimal?


Slide16 l.jpg

What if there are decimals in the problem???

If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068

Where do I put my decimal?

I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem..

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068


Slide17 l.jpg

What if there are decimals in the problem???

If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068

Where do I put my decimal?

I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem..

35.4 * 3.42 = 121068

So I will have 3 digits behind the decimal in my answer!!!

35.4 * 3.42 = 121.068


Slide18 l.jpg

35.4 * 3.42 = 121.068

Cool man!! I can’t believe it’s so easy!!!!!!!!!!!


ad