Download
lattice multiplication n.
Skip this Video
Loading SlideShow in 5 Seconds..
Lattice Multiplication PowerPoint Presentation
Download Presentation
Lattice Multiplication

Lattice Multiplication

895 Views Download Presentation
Download Presentation

Lattice Multiplication

- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
Presentation Transcript

  1. Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step

  2. 356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!

  3. I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice Multiplication. HELP!!!

  4. 356 * 25 Make a grid the exact size of your problem. A 2 digit number times a 3 digit number gets a 2 x 3 grid. Draw a diagonal line in each box. 5 3 6 2 5

  5. 356 * 25 Multiply 6 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 1 2 2 5

  6. 356 * 25 Multiply 5 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 1 1 2 0 2 5

  7. 356 * 25 Multiply 3 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. Use a zero as a place holder. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 5

  8. 356 * 25 Multiply 6 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 3 5 0

  9. 356 * 25 Multiply 5 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 2 3 5 5 0

  10. 356 * 25 Multiply 3 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0

  11. 356 * 25 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 0

  12. 356 * 25 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 0 0

  13. 356 * 25 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 9 0 0

  14. 356 * 25 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 8 5 5 0 9 0 0

  15. 356 * 25 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 8 5 5 0 9 0 0

  16. That is Soooo Cool!!! Thanks! 356 * 25 = 8,900