maths tricks n.
Download
Skip this Video
Loading SlideShow in 5 Seconds..
Maths Tricks PowerPoint Presentation
Download Presentation
Maths Tricks

Loading in 2 Seconds...

play fullscreen
1 / 16

Maths Tricks - PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 281 Views
  • Uploaded on

Maths Tricks. Vedic Maths has a lot of usage in today's world. It makes maths very simple using some tricks and makes maths fun. Trick of Multiplying a number by 11.

loader
I am the owner, or an agent authorized to act on behalf of the owner, of the copyrighted work described.
capcha
Download Presentation

Maths Tricks


An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
    Presentation Transcript
    1. Maths Tricks Vedic Maths has a lot of usage in today's world. It makes maths very simple using some tricks and makes maths fun.

    2. Trick of Multiplying a number by 11 • We all know the trick when multiplying by ten – add 0 to the end of the number, but did you know there is an equally easy trick for multiplying a two digit number by 11? This is it: Take the original number and imagine a space between the two digits (in this example we will use 52: 5_2 Now add the two numbers together and put them in the middle: 5_(5+2)_2 That is it – you have the answer: 572.

    3. Exceptions……….. • Please Note – If the numbers in the middle add up to a 2 digit number, just insert the second number and add 1 to the first: • 9_(9+9)_9 • (9+1)_8_9 • 10_8_9 • 1089 – It works every time.

    4. Lets now understand the trick by a Video

    5. Calculate reminder on dividing the number by 27 and 37  Let me explain this rule by taking examplesconsider number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder on diving this number by 27 and 37 respectively.make triplets as written below starting from units place34.........568..........276now sum of all triplets = 34+568+276 = 878divide it by 27 we get reminder as 14divide it by 37 we get reminder as 27 

    6. Examples……………….. Example. Other examples for the clarification of the rulelet the number is 2387850765triplets are 2...387...850...765sum of the triplets = 2+387+850+765 = 2004on revising the steps we get 2......004 sum = 6divide it by 27 we get reminder as 6divide it by 37 we get reminder as 6

    7. Dividing any number by 9 To find the remainder of a number after dividing it by 9… Write the first digit itself then add the next digit by the first no. and then their sum by the third digit and so on….. Note if asum exceeds 10 or is 10 then carry forward 1 to the preceeding digit

    8. Multiplying 2 numbers close to 100 • This formula can be very effectively applied in multiplication of numbers, which are nearer to bases like 10, 100, 1000 i.e., to the powers of 10 (eg: 96 x 98 or 102 x 104). • It can also be used for base numbers such as 50

    9. Case I : When both the numbers are lower than the base. • Conventional Method 97 X 94 9 7 X 9 4 3 8 8 8 7 3 X 9 1 1 8 • Vedic Method 97 3 X 94 6 9 1 1 8

    10. Case ( ii) : When both the numbers are higher than the base • Conventional Method 103 X 105 103 X 105 5 1 5 0 0 0 X 1 0 3 X X 1 0, 8 1 5 • Vedic Method For Example103 X 105 103 3 X 105 5 1 0, 8 1 5

    11. Case III: When one number is more and the other is less than the base. • Conventional Method 103 X 98 103 X 98 8 2 4 9 2 7 X 1 0, 0 9 4 • Vedic Method 103 +3 X 98 -2 1 0, 0 9 4

    12. Square of any 2 digit number  Let me explain this trick by taking examples67^2 = [6^2][7^2]+20*6*7 = 3649+840 = 4489similarly25^2 = [2^2][5^2]+20*2*5 = 425+200 = 625Take one more example97^2 = [9^2][7^2]+20*9*7 = 8149+1260 = 9409Here [] is not an operation, it is only a separation between initial 2 and last 2 digits  Example. Here an extra case arisesConsider the following examples for that 91^2 = [9^2][1^2]+20*9*1 = 8101+180 = 8281

    13. Lets now understand another trick by a Video

    14. Multiplication of 2 two-digit numbers

    15. Multiplication of 2 two-digit numbers where the first digit of both the numbers are same and the last digit of the two numbers sum to 10 (You cannot use this rule for other numbers) •  Let me explain this rule by taking examplesTo calculate 56*54: Multiply 5 by 5+1. So, 5*6 = 30. Write down 30.Multiply together the last digits: 6*4 = 24. Write down 24.The product of 56 and 54 is thus 3024.  • Example. Understand the rule by 1 more example78*72 = [7*(7+1)][8*2] = 5616

    16. Thank You • By AkashdeepRamnaney • IX – E • Roll number – 20 • Maths Club