1 / 23

240 likes | 256 Views

Multiply By Two Digits. Let’s Review. Factors- Numbers multiplied together . Product- The answer in a multiplication equation. Let’s estimate by rounding-. 23. x 12. Two Digit Multiplication . The first step is to make sure the place values are lined up. 23. x. 12. Tens. Ones.

Download Presentation
## Multiply By Two Digits

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**
Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.
Content is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use only.
Download presentation by click this link.
While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.
During download, if you can't get a presentation, the file might be deleted by the publisher.

E N D

**Let’s Review**Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation**Let’s estimate by rounding-**23 x 12**Two Digit Multiplication**The first step is to make sure the place values are lined up. 23 x 12 Tens Ones**Two Digit Multiplication**Circle the multiplier. Think, 2 x 3 equals 6. Begin with multiplying the bottom factor’s one’s place with the top factors one’s place. 23 x 12 6**Two Digit Multiplication**Think, 2x2=4 Next, multiply the 2 and the other 2. 23 x 12 4 6**Two Digit Multiplication**We are done with the first multiplier. Cross it out and circle the next multiplier (tens). 23 x 12 We need to use a 0 for a place holder. Place the 0 under the 6 in the products line. 4 6 0**Two Digit Multiplication**Next, begin to multiply the 1in the tens place with the top line factor. Think 1x3=3. 23 x 12 4 6 3 0**Two Digit Multiplication**Think 1x2=2. 23 x 12 4 6 2 3 0**Two Digit Multiplication**Add the ones place. Finally, add the two product lines to find the final product. 23 Add the tens place. x 12 4 6 Add the hundreds place. 2 X 23= 46 + 2 3 0 10 X 23= 230 2 7 6**34x 19**• 656 • 646 • 677 • None of these**Two Digit Multiplication**3 34 x 19 3 0 6 3 4 + 0 6 4 6**54x 23**• 1,242 • 1,244 • 1,342 • 1,142**Two Digit Multiplication**1 54 x 23 1 6 2 10 8 + 0 1 2 4 2**41x 18**• 748 • 778 • 738 • 728**Two Digit Multiplication**41 x 18 3 2 8 4 1 + 0 7 3 8**68x 35**• 2,370 • 2,345 • 3,270 • 2,380**Two Digit Multiplication**2 4 68 x 35 3 4 0 20 4 + 0 2 3 8 0**76x 52**• 3,952 • 4,952 • 3,852 • 3,552**Two Digit Multiplication**3 1 76 x 52 1 5 2 38 0 + 0 3 9 5 2**94x 76**• 7,044 • 7,144 • 6,044 • 6,244**Two Digit Multiplication**2 2 94 x 76 5 6 4 65 8 + 0 7 1 4 4

More Related