Lesson 4 13 example 1
This presentation is the property of its rightful owner.
Sponsored Links
1 / 7

Lesson 4-13 Example 1 PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 37 Views
  • Uploaded on
  • Presentation posted in: General

2-5. Example 1. Lesson 4-13 Example 1. Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 1. Rewrite the problem in vertical format. 52 × 27. 2-5. Example 1. Lesson 4-13 Example 1. Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

Download Presentation

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

Presentation Transcript


Lesson 4 13 example 1

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

1.Rewrite the problem in vertical format.

52× 27


Lesson 4 13 example 11

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

2.Multiply 7 times the number in the ones column.

7 × 2 = 14

52× 27

14


Lesson 4 13 example 12

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

3.Multiply 7 times the number in the tens column.

7 × 50 = 350

52× 27

14

350


Lesson 4 13 example 13

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

4.Multiply 20 times the number in the ones column.

20 × 2 = 40

52× 27

14

350

40


Lesson 4 13 example 14

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

5.Multiply 20 times the number in the tens column.

20 × 50 = 1,000

52× 27

14

350

40

1,000


Lesson 4 13 example 15

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

6.Add the partial products.

14 + 350 + 40 + 1,000 = 1,404

52× 27

14

350

40

1,000

1,404


Lesson 4 13 example 16

2-5

Example 1

Lesson 4-13 Example 1

Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method.

7.The product is 1,404.


  • Login