L a t t i c e m u l t i p l i c a t i o n
Download
1 / 19

L a t t i c e M u l t i p l i c a t i o n - PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 91 Views
  • Uploaded on

L a t t i c e M u l t i p l i c a t i o n. The coolest way to multiply ! By : Merilee Cox Grade: 4. Standard. M4N3. Students will solve problems involving multiplication of 2-3 digit numbers by 1 or 2 digit numbers. . Lattice Multiplication may give you a new way to get to same answer. .

loader
I am the owner, or an agent authorized to act on behalf of the owner, of the copyrighted work described.
capcha
Download Presentation

PowerPoint Slideshow about ' L a t t i c e M u l t i p l i c a t i o n' - gotzon


An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -
Presentation Transcript
L a t t i c e m u l t i p l i c a t i o n

Lattice Multiplication

The coolest way to multiply!

By: Merilee Cox

Grade: 4


Standard
Standard

  • M4N3. Students will solve problems involving multiplication of 2-3 digit numbers by 1 or 2 digit numbers.




Let s try 4 x 3
Let’s try 4 x 3 ones:

3

4

1

2

So, 4 x 3 = 12



Let s try 3 x 2
Let’s try 3 x 2 ones:

2

3

0

6

So, 3 x 2 = 6



I ones:

Let’s take another look!

1

4

5

6

5

0

0

2

0

0

6

2

4


Now just add down the diagonal stripes start at the bottom and work your way up the stripes
Now, just add down the diagonal stripes...  Start at the bottom and work your way up the stripes:


I bottom and work your way up the stripes:

Here is another look!

1

4

5

6

5

0

0

2

0

0

6

2

4

0

8

4

7

So, 14 x 56 = 784


I bottom and work your way up the stripes:

Let’s Do Another One!

17 x 52

1

7

5

2

5

0

0

3

5

0

2

1

4

0

8

4

8

So, 17 x 52 = 884


We can also do three digit by two digit 240 x 13

2 bottom and work your way up the stripes:

0

1

We Can Also Do Three Digit by Two Digit 240 x 13

3

0

1

2

4

0

1

3

0

2

0

4

0

0

0

6

1

0

0

2

So, 240 x 13 = 3,120


So what do you think? bottom and work your way up the stripes:


ad