Multiplication 2 digit x 2 digit
This presentation is the property of its rightful owner.
Sponsored Links
1 / 11

Multiplication 2 digit x 2 digit PowerPoint PPT Presentation


  • 344 Views
  • Uploaded on
  • Presentation posted in: General

Multiplication 2 digit x 2 digit. 5 th Grade Math CM2 FK2. Learning Objective. I will learn to multiply 2 digit x 2 digit numbers 30 x 45 51 x 19. Steps to use Box Method of Multiplication. Example #1. 42 x 32. 40. 2. You can be a multiplication master young grasshopper!. 30. 1200.

Download Presentation

Multiplication 2 digit x 2 digit

An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.


- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

Presentation Transcript


Multiplication 2 digit x 2 digit

Multiplication2 digit x 2 digit

5th Grade Math

CM2 FK2


Learning objective

LearningObjective

  • I will learn to multiply 2 digit x 2 digit numbers

  • 30 x 45

  • 51 x 19


Steps to use box method of multiplication

Steps to use Box Method of Multiplication


Example 1

Example #1

  • 42 x 32

40

2

You can be a multiplication master young grasshopper!

30

1200

60

+

+

80

4

2

Answer: 1,344


Example 2

Example #2

  • 83 x 56

80

Be one with the numbers… use expanded form

3

50

150

4000

+

+

480

18

6

Answer: 4648


Example 3

Example #3

  • 98 x 45

90

8

40

3600

320

+

+

450

40

5

Answer: 4,410


Example 4

Example #4

  • 34 x 99

The only weapon I need is my BRAIN! HI-YAH!

30

4

90

360

2700

+

+

36

9

270

Answer: 3,366


Have you mastered multiplying 2 digits x 2 digits

Have you mastered multiplying 2 digits x 2 digits?

  • Solve each problem to prove you are a multiplication ninja (1 digit x 2 digit)

  • A. 65 x 48 =

  • B. 72 x 72=

  • C. 93 x 43=

  • Use your calculator after you find your answer to check your answer

3,120

5,184

3,999


Solve and follow the directions

Solve and follow the directions:

  • Solve 45 x 97

  • Answer: 4,365

  • If the product is less than 4,00 stand near the door

  • If the product is an even number stand near the carpet

  • If the product is greater than 4,000 but less than 5,000 sit on the floor near the computers


Solve and follow the directions1

Solve and follow the directions:

  • Solve 78 x 41

  • Answer: 3,198

  • If the product is more than 4,00 but less than 4,300 stand near the computers

  • If the product is an even number sit on the carpet

  • If the product has two 8’s in it sit under your desk


Congratulations

Congratulations!

You’ve mastered 2 digit x 2 digit

multiplication!

Multiplication Master


  • Login