Loading in 5 sec....

VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic OperationsPowerPoint Presentation

VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic Operations

- 311 Views
- Updated On :

VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic Operations. T. K. Prasad http://www.cs.wright.edu/~tkprasad. 45 * 63 = (4 * 10 + 5) * (6 * 10 + 3) = 4 * 10 * 6 * 10 + 4 * 10 * 3 + 5 * 6 * 10 + 5 * 3. = 4 * 6 * 100 + 4 * 3 * 10

Related searches for VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic Operations

Download Presentation
## PowerPoint Slideshow about 'VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic Operations' - Olivia

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**

Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.

- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - E N D - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

Presentation Transcript

### VEDIC MATHEMATICS : Arithmetic Operations

### Two Digit Multiplication (of Large Digits in terms of Small Digits) using Vedic Approach

T. K. Prasad

http://www.cs.wright.edu/~tkprasad

Arithmetic Operations

45 * 63

= (4 * 10 + 5)

* (6 * 10 + 3)

= 4 * 10 * 6 * 10

+ 4 * 10 * 3

+ 5 * 6 * 10

+ 5 * 3

= 4 * 6 * 100

+ 4 * 3 * 10

+ 5 * 6* 10

+ 5 * 3

= 24 * 100

+ (12 + 30) * 10

+ 15

Multiplying NumbersArithmetic Operations

= 24 * 100

+ (12 + 30) * 10

+ 15

= 24 * 100

+ 42 * 10

+ 15

= 1 5

1 2 x

3 0 x

2 4 x x

= 2 8 3 5

Multiplying NumbersArithmetic Operations

Method : Vertically and Crosswise Sutra

Correctness and Applicability

Arithmetic Operations

Alternatively, 100’s complement of d Digits) using Vedic Approach 1 d2 (d2≠ 0) is (9 - d1) (10 - d2).

HC(35) =

9 10

-3 -5

6 5

HC(11) =

89

HC(35) =

65

HC(94) =

6

100’s Complement100’s complement of a 2-digit number n is (100 – n).

Arithmetic Operations

Method: Digits) using Vedic Approach Multiply 79 * 97

- Write the first number to be multiplied and its 100’s complement in the first row, and the second number to be multiplied and its 100’s complement in the second row.
79 21

97 03

Arithmetic Operations

79 Digits) using Vedic Approach 21

97 03

- To determine the 4-digit product:
- subtractcrosswise to obtain the left digits
- (79 – 03) = (97 – 21) = 76

- and
- multiply the complements vertically to obtain the right digits.
- (21 * 03) = 63

- subtractcrosswise to obtain the left digits
- 79 * 97 = 7663

Arithmetic Operations

Another Example Digits) using Vedic Approach

- 89 * 91 =
- 89 11
- 91 09
- 80 99
- 89 * 91 = 8099

Arithmetic Operations

Questions Digits) using Vedic Approach

- Why do both crosswise subtractions yield the same result?
- Why does this method yield the correct answer for this example?
- Does this method always work for any pair of digits?

Arithmetic Operations

Proof Sketch Digits) using Vedic Approach

- (89 – 9) = (91 – 11) = 80
- Why are they same?
- (89 – (100 – 91)) = (89 + 91 – 100) = 80
- (91 – (100 – 89)) = (91 + 89 – 100) = 80

Arithmetic Operations

89 = (100 – 11) Digits) using Vedic Approach

91 = (100 – 9)

89 * 91

= 89 * (100 – 9)

= 89 * 100 – (100 – 11) * 9

= 89 * 100 – 100 * 9+ (11 * 9)

= 100 * (89– 9) + 99

= 100 * 80 + 99

= 8099

89 = (100 – 11)

91 = (100 – 9)

89 * 91

= (100 – 11) * 91

= 100 * 91 – 11 * (100 – 9)

= 100 * 91 – 11 * 100 + (11 * 9)

= 100 * (91– 11) + 99

= 100 * 80 + 99

= 8099

Correctness of Product :Two possibilitiesRight digit

[Vertical

Product]

Right digit

[Vertical

Product]

Left digit

[Crosswise

Subtraction]

Left digit

[Crosswise

Subtraction]

Arithmetic Operations

Another Example Digits) using Vedic Approach

- 69 * 88
69 31

88 12

57 372

60 72

- Note that, the product of the 100’s complements has more than two digits (exceeds 100) . However, the weight associated with 57 and 3 is 100, and hence they can be combined.

Arithmetic Operations

Yet Another Example Digits) using Vedic Approach

- 30 * 21
30 70

21 79

– 49 5530

– 49+55 30

6 30

This approach is validwith suggested modifications but not very useful!

Breakdown?!

Arithmetic Operations

Download Presentation

Connecting to Server..